U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00065-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gomez-Llanos et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Order]
  • December 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order to Seal Document]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Joinder]
  • November 11, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 15, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • June 16, 2022: [Continue]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • June 15, 2022: [Withdraw as Counsel]
  • June 15, 2022: [Suppress]
  • June 15, 2022: [Extension of Time]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 18, 2022: [Continue]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order]
  • March 21, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • March 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 02, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • February 28, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • February 28, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 28, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • February 28, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • February 28, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.