U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00056-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Flores-Valenzuela
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 24, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 20, 2023: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 10, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 14, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 22, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 09, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • March 10, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • March 01, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.