U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ramirez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order]
  • March 23, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • March 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • March 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ]
  • March 01, 2022: [Writ]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.