U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00508-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bareford
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Order and Report on Person Under Supervision]
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 30, 2022: [Petition and Order]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel]
  • March 09, 2022: [Withdraw as Counsel]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 08, 2022: [Substitute Attorney]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 01, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • March 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.