U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00066-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Acosta-Velasquez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • December 16, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
  • December 15, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 13, 2022: [Continue]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • November 23, 2022: [Hearing]
  • November 22, 2022: [Trial Order]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 10, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 10, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 22, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel]
  • August 03, 2022: [Withdraw as Counsel]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Withdraw as Counsel]
  • July 21, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • March 03, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • March 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 02, 2022: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.