U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00049-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lawrence
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 09, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 05, 2023: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 10, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 12, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 28, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • March 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 02, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • March 02, 2022: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.