U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Taylor et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • May 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 23, 2022: [Bond]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • March 03, 2022: [Writ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.