U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00033-1
  • Case Name: USA v.Feo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Release Order]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 07, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 09, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 06, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Review of Detention]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 06, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 09, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • March 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 09, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • March 08, 2022: [Detention]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • March 03, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.