U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00075-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mize
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • June 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 26, 2022: [Exclude]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Review of Detention]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • April 04, 2022: [Review of Detention]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • March 10, 2022: [Furlough]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • March 09, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • March 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 04, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • March 03, 2022: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.