U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gressman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • May 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • March 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 07, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • March 03, 2022: [Detention]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.