U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cr-00128-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Chen et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 22, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • November 10, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • October 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 09, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 26, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 06, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 29, 2022: [Detention]
  • March 25, 2022: [Order]
  • March 22, 2022: [Review of Detention by District Judge]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Review of Detention by District Judge]
  • March 21, 2022: [Review of Detention by District Judge]
  • March 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 17, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • March 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • March 14, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 12, 2022: [Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • March 03, 2022: [Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.