U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00026-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Beltran
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 29, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 29, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 20, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 31, 2022: [Continue]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 25, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 14, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • March 14, 2022: [Detention]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.