U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00005-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fernandez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order Withdrawing Order of Referral]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • June 24, 2022: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • April 29, 2022: [Withdraw as Counsel]
  • April 29, 2022: [Exclude]
  • April 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • April 28, 2022: [Exclude]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • March 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 07, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.