U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00074-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order]
  • October 03, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 24, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 02, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • March 04, 2022: [Brady Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.