U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00050-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Otto
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 01, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 23, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 12, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 15, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 15, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • March 04, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • March 04, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.