U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00012-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Evans
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Judgment]
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • September 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Continue]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.