U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Griego, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Opt Out of In-Person Hearing]
  • August 09, 2022: [Opt Out of In-Person Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • May 03, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Order Vacating Hearing or Trial]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • April 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • March 15, 2022: [Strike]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.