U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00143-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Logan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 03, 2023: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 03, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 09, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • March 07, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.