U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00055-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nephi
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Amended Judgment]
  • May 05, 2025: [Release Order]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 17, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 22, 2022: [Release Order]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 09, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 06, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • March 11, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 10, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • March 10, 2022: [Detention]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.