U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00072-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fox
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 06, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 06, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • March 11, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 11, 2022: [Detention]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 08, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.