U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00035-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Shumway
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 01, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 06, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • March 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 17, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • March 16, 2022: [Detention]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • March 10, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.