U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00087-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Parra-Quintero
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 05, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 23, 2022: [Exclude]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel]
  • May 19, 2022: [Withdraw as Counsel]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel]
  • April 06, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
  • April 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • April 05, 2022: [Withdraw as Counsel]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 10, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • March 10, 2022: [~Util - Interpreter Required]
  • March 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 10, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.