U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00086-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Batalla-Landa et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel]
  • April 23, 2025: [Withdraw as Counsel]
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Order and Report on Person Under Supervision]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • September 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • September 13, 2022: [Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 16, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • May 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • May 11, 2022: [Continue]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel]
  • May 05, 2022: [Withdraw as Counsel]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • March 10, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • March 10, 2022: [~Util - Interpreter Required]
  • March 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.