U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rende et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 31, 2024: [Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Dismissal]
  • July 07, 2022: [Leave to File Dismissal per Rule 48(a)]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 31, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • March 31, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • March 25, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • March 10, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.