U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00030-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Carrero
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • November 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 26, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • October 26, 2022: [Review of Detention]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 14, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • July 21, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Review of Detention]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 23, 2022: [Review of Detention]
  • May 23, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • March 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 15, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • March 15, 2022: [Detention]
  • March 10, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.