U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00111-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lujan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 29, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 28, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 17, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 12, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 17, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 13, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • March 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 22, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • March 14, 2022: [Detention]
  • March 14, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.