U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00036-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Grundy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • January 06, 2023: [Petition and Order]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 13, 2022: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 03, 2022: [Petition and Order]
  • November 02, 2022: [Petition and Order]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 14, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Review of Detention]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • August 09, 2022: [Review of Detention]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 13, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • March 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 16, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • March 15, 2022: [Detention]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • March 15, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.