U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kennedy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Order Vacating Hearing or Trial]
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 02, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 02, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 02, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order]
  • April 06, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.