U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00039-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Scudder
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Order]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 18, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 17, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order]
  • August 30, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 30, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Reassign Case]
  • March 24, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • March 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • March 24, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 24, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • March 23, 2022: [Reassign Case]
  • March 18, 2022: [Detention]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 17, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.