U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00092-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Perez-Tena
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 03, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 31, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 23, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • March 17, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • March 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.