U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00027-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Birch
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • September 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Strike]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 25, 2022: [Continue]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • March 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 17, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.