U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Davila
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 19, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 18, 2023: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 14, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 15, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 13, 2022: [Continue]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 18, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.