U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00040-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Perez-Maldonado
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 24, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 24, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • March 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 23, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • March 23, 2022: [Detention]
  • March 17, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.