U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00032-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Harriman-Valdez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Order and Report on Person Under Supervision]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 09, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 09, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 04, 2023: [Continue]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • September 21, 2022: [Review of Detention]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 20, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 14, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 17, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 13, 2022: [Continue]
  • May 06, 2022: [Petition and Order]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • March 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 22, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • March 21, 2022: [Detention]
  • March 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • March 18, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.