U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00056-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CLAYTON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
  • April 18, 2025: [Early Termination of Probation]
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • January 18, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 08, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 17, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 18, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 24, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • March 24, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 24, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • March 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • March 21, 2022: [Detention]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.