U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00452-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Verholtz II
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 17, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Continue]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 23, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • March 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 22, 2022: [Brady Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.