U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00113-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brady
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Order]
  • July 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 14, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Order]
  • June 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 13, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 10, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [Order]
  • April 04, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 01, 2022: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.