U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00103-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ponton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • June 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 01, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • April 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.