U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00102-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Adelman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Petition and Order]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 12, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 05, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 09, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 06, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
  • April 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 01, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • April 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.