U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00474-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Breeze
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • September 07, 2022: [Continue]
  • September 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 26, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 18, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 06, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • April 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 01, 2022: [Brady Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.