U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Machado et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 17, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 09, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 06, 2023: [Continue]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order]
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 26, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Petition and Order]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 27, 2022: [Continue]
  • June 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order and Report on Person Under Supervision]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • April 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order of Recusal]
  • April 01, 2022: [Continue]
  • April 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • April 01, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.