U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00111-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Baydo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Hearing]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 06, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 27, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • April 01, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • April 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.