U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00064-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Aguila
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 03, 2022: [Continue]
  • June 02, 2022: [Trial Order]
  • June 02, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 08, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • April 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 07, 2022: [Detention]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.