U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00045-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Alejandre
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 13, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • April 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 06, 2022: [Detention]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.