U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00110-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Espinoza
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 14, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 23, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Reassign Case]
  • April 13, 2022: [Reassign Case]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • April 12, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 05, 2022: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.