U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00057-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sohil
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Amended Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 06, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • April 05, 2022: [Detention]
  • April 05, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.