U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00122-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Fisilau et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • June 02, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 02, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • June 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 24, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 24, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order Vacating Hearing or Trial]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • May 03, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • April 20, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • April 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 12, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 08, 2022: [Detention]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • April 07, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 07, 2022: [Detention]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 06, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.