U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00118-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kirschner
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 17, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 24, 2022: [Continue]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • April 15, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • April 11, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.