U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00123-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stroud
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • September 08, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • September 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 01, 2022: [Continue]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • April 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.