U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00035-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Silva-Gonzalez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 23, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 13, 2023: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 20, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel]
  • July 07, 2022: [Withdraw as Counsel]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 17, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 11, 2022: [~Util - Interpreter Required]
  • April 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 07, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.